Accounts and annual returns ST MARGARET, SOUTH ELMHAM PARISH LAND TRUST

Charity number: 260899
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 29 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 29 July 2011 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required