Accounts and annual returns THE HAME TRUST

Charity number: 261070
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2014 10 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2013 12 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required