Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL BUILDING SPECIFICATION LIMITED

Charity number: 261206
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 20 December 2012 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 18 November 2011 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required