Accounts and annual returns THE PRINCESS MARINA MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 261689
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 03 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 07 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 15 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 13 November 2007 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 30 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required