Accounts and annual returns ST FRANCIS ANIMAL WELFARE GROUP

Charity number: 263172
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2016 20 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 20 July 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2015 09 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 09 July 2016 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2014 21 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 22 June 2015 On Time