Trustees THE BLONDE D'AQUITAINE BREEDERS' SOCIETY FOR GREAT BRITAIN LIMITED
Charity Number: 263260

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Eustice Kingdon | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ryder | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Thomas Barrett | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Alice Corner | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Menna Elisabeth Evans | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Shenton | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Mycock | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HOPLEY | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MCELROY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISTAIR MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES ANDREW WEIGHTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.