Accounts and annual returns FRANCIS WEBB TRUST (BRISTOL SAVAGES)

Charity number: 263418
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2007 04 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 12 February 2007 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2005 08 February 2006 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2004 09 March 2005 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 Not Required