Trustees THE WEST ESSEX ARCHAEOLOGICAL GROUP
Charity number: 263486

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony O'Connor | Chair | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Hunter | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Hoskin | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Grace Irene Jarvis | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Colin Robert Mann | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ODETTE NELSON | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN AVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW KENNETH MADELEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.