Governing document ARCHDEACON BURNEY'S CHARITY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 20/12/1865 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14/08/1934 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25/09/1975 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 OCT 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
GRANTS NOT EXCEEDING £1000 OR LESS THAN £50 TO SUCH SICK AND INFIRM CLERGYMEN OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WHO SHALL FOR NOT LESS THAN 3 YEARS IMMEDIATELY PRECEDING THE TIME OF MAKING SUCH GRANTS HAVE EITHER BEEN INCUMBENTS OF SOME BENEFICE WITHIN THAT PORTION OF THE FORMER DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER WHICH WAS SITUATED IN THE COUNTIES OF ESSEX AND HERTS OR IN THE ARCHDEADONRY OF BEDFORD OR WHO HAVE HELD OR AT LEAST 3 YEARS LICENSES AS CURATES IN THE SAME AREA. PROVIDING AN EXHIBITION OF EXHIBITIONS NOT TO EXCEED £50 PER ANNUM FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR A CHILD OF SUCH CLERGYMEN.
Area of benefit
FORMER DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.