Financial history THE YERCOMBE (GLOUCESTERSHIRE) TRUST

Charity number: 263687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £548.29k £521.23k £488.29k £549.45k £708.35k
Total expenditure £692.16k £589.60k £650.77k £745.14k £739.64k
Income from government contracts £189.08k £129.23k £206.83k £128.66k £100.82k
Income from government grants £669 £105.74k £37.77k £1.69k £849
Income - Donations and legacies £4.23k £152.79k N/A £7.91k £108.92k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £494.83k £323.50k N/A £484.24k £552.59k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £49.13k £43.75k N/A £54.40k £40.33k
Income - Other £100 £1.20k N/A £2.90k £6.51k
Income - Legacies £0 £37.51k N/A £0 £96.23k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £687.28k £579.22k N/A £729.49k £717.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.88k £4.65k N/A £5.09k £3.77k
Expenditure - Governance £6.30k £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £4.88k £4.65k N/A £4.47k £3.77k
Expenditure - Other £0 £5.74k N/A £10.57k £18.74k