Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF CHARLES BONTON

Charity number: 263750
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 09 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 29 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 27 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 09 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required