Accounts and annual returns THE ITT (UK) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263990
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2008 20 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 12 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2007 04 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 06 July 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2006 26 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 13 March 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2005 14 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 14 June 2006 45 days late