Financial history CHORLEYWOOD COMMUNITY ARTS CENTRE

Charity number: 264413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.46k £1.15k £21.06k £27.33k £36.23k
Total expenditure £45.27k £4.14k £20.71k £31.81k £26.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A