Financial history THE KARENZA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 264520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £37.86k £33.51k £43.03k £42.20k £45.25k
Total expenditure £36.37k £33.85k £34.61k £29.40k £39.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A