Financial history THE DARBY TAYLOR MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 264581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.62k £6.35k £5.64k £5.02k £6.50k
Total expenditure £10.00k £10.50k £1.50k £7.50k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A