Accounts and annual returns ALBURY FRIENDSHIP CLUB

Charity number: 265185
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2011 21 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2010 10 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2009 16 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 02 September 2009 On Time