Accounts and annual returns THE SUNDERLAND TRUST

Charity number: 265462
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2006 14 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 19 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2005 17 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 20 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2004 10 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 13 December 2004 On Time