Trustees DENFORD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 265466

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART BOOTH | Chair | 26 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Mary Equi | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Louise Dodge | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Carter | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Dorothy Prodger | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Baren | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sallee Carter | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ELLISON | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN ROGERS | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alan Morton | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.