Governing document THE MURRAY SMITH (ST ANDREWS HOME, MATLOCK) TRUST
Charity number: 265981
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEEDS DATED 1ST NOVEMBER 1929 AND 13TH OCTOBER 1930 AND SCHEMES OF THE 13TH NOVEMBER 1969 AND 16TH MAY 1973
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF HIGHER EDUCATION, APPRENTICESHIP OR TRAINING (INCLUDING THE MAKING OF LOANS, FREE OF INTEREST IF THOUGH FIT) OR OTHER SIMILAR BENEFIT OR ADVANCEMENT FOR BOYS. IN AUGMENTATION OF THE INCOME OF THE MURRAY SMITH TRUST COMPRISED IN A SCHEME OF 13TH NOVEMBER 1939.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.