Financial history FALMER ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 266119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.40k £11.45k £11.98k £15.14k £17.35k
Total expenditure £17.69k £6.66k £7.47k £7.02k £8.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A