Accounts and annual returns THE BRISTOL THREATENED HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 266159
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 April 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 August 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 August 2019 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required