Charity overview CHARITY FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONGREGATION OF LA RETRAITE

Charity number: 1189341-1
Linked charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JULY 1973 AND AMENDED ON 29TH JUNE 1998. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 APR 2021 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 27 APR 2021
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION OF LA RETRAITE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
  • 14 September 1973: Standard registration
Other names
  • CONGREGATION OF LA RETRAITE TRUSTEES (Working name)
  • SISTERS OF LA RETRAITE (Working name)
  • CONGREGATION OF LA RETRAITE TRUSTEES (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of