Financial history THE LEWIS CARROLL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 266239
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £7.68k £9.02k £6.04k £8.49k £7.66k
Total expenditure £6.06k £10.59k £24.77k £6.27k £8.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A