Accounts and annual returns THE ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS (GREENWICH AND DISTRICT)

Charity number: 266900
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 13 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 13 June 2012 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 25 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required