Financial history COLCHESTER RURAL AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 266929
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £5.61k £1.71k £1.59k £1.57k £4.34k
Total expenditure £5.61k £2.19k £2.10k £2.10k £2.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A