Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITIES OF ABRAHAM ATKINS

Charity number: 268060
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 03 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 18 December 2009 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 25 November 2008 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 09 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 23 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required