Trustees ROTHERFIELD VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 268271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judith Hardy Trustee 11 April 2024
ROTHERFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
Josephine Harewood Trustee 11 April 2024
ROTHERFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
Adam Hardy Trustee 11 January 2024
HENRY SMITH (ROTHERFIELD SHARE)
Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
ROTHERFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
Mark Simmonds Trustee 11 January 2024
ROTHERFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
Sharon Turner Trustee 08 September 2022
ROTHERFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
Cynthia Yates Trustee 19 August 2021
ROTHERFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
Vicky Cheeseman Trustee 13 October 2020
ROTHERFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
ANDREW MILLER Trustee 08 May 2014
THE SOCIETY OF THE ROTHERFIELD PLAYERS
Received: On time
MARK ALEXANDER HOWARD Trustee
ROTHERFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
JEFF THOMAS Trustee
ROTHERFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
ANN VERONICA SIMMONDS Trustee
None on record
PHILIP IRELAND Trustee
None on record