Financial history SAMPFORD BRETT VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 268277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £13.60k £21.18k £8.45k £5.88k £7.21k
Total expenditure £1.82k £2.24k £21.78k £4.87k £5.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.42k N/A N/A N/A