Financial history VILLAGE HALL (KNOWN AS ELIOT HALL)

Charity number: 268459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £16.29k £21.60k £7.61k £10.58k £5.83k
Total expenditure £4.87k £20.02k £4.50k £4.70k £8.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.57k £17.60k N/A N/A N/A