Accounts and annual returns ROSE MARY CRAWSHAY PRIZE FOR ENGLISH LITERATURE

Charity number: 268686
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 09 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 April 2008 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 03 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required