Financial history WILLIAMSON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 268782
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2012 13/04/2013 14/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016
Total gross income £9.91k £9.34k £9.39k £9.12k £5.47k
Total expenditure £9.49k £9.96k £9.43k £9.51k £5.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A