Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL NAVAL VOLUNTEER RESERVE (AUXILIARY PATROL) CLUB WELFARE FUND

Charity Number: 269050
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 10 November 2008 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 20 November 2008 20 days late
Annual return 31 December 2006 07 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 22 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 20 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required