Financial history NEWNHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 269054
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.19k £13.83k £5.07k £10.77k £10.20k
Total expenditure £6.25k £6.11k £7.60k £8.88k £9.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A