Financial history PALGRAVE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 269132
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £33.14k £36.88k £31.98k £36.40k £32.38k
Total expenditure £46.89k £21.97k £20.15k £40.08k £53.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.20k £20.23k N/A N/A