Financial history FRIENDS OF DORKING COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (SUPPORTING LOCAL HEALTH CARE)

Charity number: 269369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.89k £7.59k £9.95k £9.63k £17.15k
Total expenditure £14.69k £3.88k £27.05k £1.81k £2.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A