Accounts and annual returns MARTIN DAVIES'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 269416
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 07 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required