Accounts and annual returns THE FISHGATE TRUST

Charity number: 269532
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2013 18 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2012 25 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2011 22 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 10 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required