Accounts and annual returns RADIO 590

Charity Number: 269552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 06 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 14 October 2022 318 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required