Financial history CHARITIES OF THE REV MALISE ARCHIBALD CUNNINGHAME GRAHAM FOR 1. CHOIR 2. APPRENTICING

Charity Number: 269660
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £336 £584 £392 £569 £17.77k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £25.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0