Accounts and annual returns CHELSEA YOUTH CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 269937
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 18 November 2008 292 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 12 February 2007 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time