Accounts and annual returns BROS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 269985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 22 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 29 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 29 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required