Governing document IBS-STL U.K.
Charity Number: 270162
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JUNE 1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 14 DECEMBER 1981, 28 MAY 1982,11 DECEMBER 1992,11 JANUARY 1993,24 SEPTEMBER 1996,5 FEBRUARY 2004,5 AND 28 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED 11 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2. THE DIRECT RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POVERTY BY ASSISTING ANY SICK OR NECESSITOUS PERSON.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.