Governing document HOSPITAL RADIO NORWICH
Charity Number: 270189

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 29TH NOVEMBER 1978, 7TH NOVEMBER 1979, 27TH FEBRUARY 1984, 24TH FEBRUARY 1988, 22ND JANUARY 1989, 27TH FEBRUARY 1991 AND 24 FEBRUARY 1993 AND 12TH MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND THE STRESS AND DISTRESS CAUSED TO PERSONS THROUGH HOSPITALISATION AS WELL AS HELP TO DISTRACT FROM THE MONOTONY OF HOSPITAL ROUTINE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE AREA SERVED BY NORFOLK AREA HEALTH AUTHORITY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.