Governing document CFI INTERNATIONAL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH DECEMBER 1948 AS AMENDED 31ST MAY 1979, 11TH MAY 1983, 14TH DECEMBER 1983, AND 3RD JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SCIENCE OF PRODUCING AND THE ART OF MARKETING, DESIGNING AND RETAILING CLOTHING AND FOOTWEAR, AND THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS AS TECHNICIANS TECHNOLOGISTS AND FOR MANAGMENT AND SUPERVISORY POSITIONS IN THE INDISTRIES CONCERNED, AND THEREBY TO IMPROVE THE STANDARDS OF SERVICE TO THE PUBLIC OF THE CLOTHING AND FOOTWEAR INDUSTRIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED(IN PRACTICE PRIMARILY UNITED KINGDOM, THE COMMONWEALTH, AND THE EEC)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.