Accounts and annual returns THE C L I C TRUST

Charity number: 270769
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 17 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 30 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 17 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 01 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 15 July 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required