Accounts and annual returns THE NAN AND JACK MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 270812
Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2022 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required