Accounts and annual returns WYMONDHAM AND DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 270909
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 13 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 13 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 13 October 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 13 October 2004 On Time