Accounts and annual returns LEADEN RODING VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 271237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 April 2025 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 April 2025 434 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 August 2024 554 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 March 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required