Accounts and annual returns IXWORTH SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 271352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 July 2022 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 July 2022 543 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required