Accounts and annual returns CAPEL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 271366
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2023 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2023 728 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 October 2020 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 October 2020 116 days late